AZ SB1468 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Homeowners' associations; design guidelines; rules
Title
Homeowners' associations; design guidelines; rules
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Gould [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-22 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2011-03-01 | House read second time | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Consent Calendar February 14, 2011 @ 1:30 PM | |
2011-02-17 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |