AZ SB1456 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sex education instruction; parental rights
Title
Sex education instruction; parental rights
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] | Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] | Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Governor Vetoed | |
2021-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2021-04-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Charter School Governing Body
Course Of Study
Delayed Repeal
Education - Title 15
Minimum Grade
Parental Rights
Public Hearings
Review
Review And Approval Of Materials
School Curricula
School District Governing Board
Sex Education Instruction
Sexual Conduct With A Minor
Course Of Study
Delayed Repeal
Education - Title 15
Minimum Grade
Parental Rights
Public Hearings
Review
Review And Approval Of Materials
School Curricula
School District Governing Board
Sex Education Instruction
Sexual Conduct With A Minor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |