AZ SB1453 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Chapter 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Chapter 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DUI; license suspension; records
Title
DUI; license suspension; records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Chapter 109 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-11-10-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-20 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Administrative License Suspension
Alcohol Or Other Drug Screening
Application Fee
Assault
Certified Report
Civil Liability
Definition
Driving Under The Influence (dui)
Dui (see Also: Driving Under The Influence)
Education
Exemption From Rulemaking
Hearing
Homicide
Ignition Interlock Device Requirement
Implied Consent
License Records
License Suspension
Notification Of Suspension
Order Of Suspension
Prior Convictions
Procedures
Records
Report
Review
Special Ignition Interlock Restricted Driver License
Summary Review
Supervised Probation
Temporary Permit
Tests
Transportation - Title 28
Treatment
Alcohol Or Other Drug Screening
Application Fee
Assault
Certified Report
Civil Liability
Definition
Driving Under The Influence (dui)
Dui (see Also: Driving Under The Influence)
Education
Exemption From Rulemaking
Hearing
Homicide
Ignition Interlock Device Requirement
Implied Consent
License Records
License Suspension
Notification Of Suspension
Order Of Suspension
Prior Convictions
Procedures
Records
Report
Review
Special Ignition Interlock Restricted Driver License
Summary Review
Supervised Probation
Temporary Permit
Tests
Transportation - Title 28
Treatment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1387 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |