AZ SB1443 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Marijuana; postsecondary education; medical research
Title
Marijuana; postsecondary education; medical research
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] | Sen. Linda Lopez [D] | Rep. Chad Campbell [D] | Sen. Katie Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Jack Jackson [D] | Sen. Kelli Ward [R] | Sen. Lela Alston [D] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Rep. Eric Meyer [D] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Governor Signed | |
2013-05-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-04-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-04-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-19-4-0) |
2013-04-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House HEWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to House HEWD Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Assigned to House HEWD Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |