AZ SB1442 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2440
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hazardous vegetation removal; state forester
Title
Hazardous vegetation removal; state forester
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Chapter 44 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2440 (Replaces) 2021-02-11 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
Appropriations
Hazardous Vegetation Removal
Intergovernmental Agreements
Public Agency
Public Lands - Title 37
State Forester
Hazardous Vegetation Removal
Intergovernmental Agreements
Public Agency
Public Lands - Title 37
State Forester
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 1306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 483 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |