AZ SB1442 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Chapter 163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Chapter 163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modifications; corrections officer retirement plan
Title
Modifications; corrections officer retirement plan
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] |
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 163 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (23-7-0-0) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-3-4-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2017-03-20 | House | House BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Assigned to House BI Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 843 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 848.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 863 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 867 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 870 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 870.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 870.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 870.07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 881 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 881.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 884 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 885 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 885.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 885.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 886.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 888 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 891 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 895.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 905 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 905.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 905.02 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 905.03 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 905.04 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 905.05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 905.06 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 914 | New Code | See Bill Text |