AZ SB1437 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
National defense laws; prohibited actions
Title
National defense laws; prohibited actions
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-04-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-23-3-0) |
2016-04-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-04-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | House FSR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-1-0) |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |