AZ SB1417 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Distributed energy generation systems

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distributed energy generation systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Energy Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-21 Chapter 56
2016-03-21 Governor Signed
2016-03-17 Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-17SenateSenate final reading , voting: (29-0-1-0)
2016-03-17SenateSenate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2016-03-17SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-17SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-16HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-03-16HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (49-11-0-0)
2016-03-16HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-03-15HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-15HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-14HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2016-02-23HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-07HouseHouse EENR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0)
2016-02-24HouseReferred to House EENR Committee
2016-02-24HouseHouse read second time
2016-02-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-02-23HouseAssigned to House EENR Committee
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-02-19SenateTransmit to House
2016-02-18SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (23-6-1-0)
2016-02-18SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended
2016-02-01SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-08SenateSenate WE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2016-02-02SenateReferred to Senate WE Committee
2016-02-02SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate WE Committee
2016-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=SB1417
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1417p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1417s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1417h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0056.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/s.14171258.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/s.1417we.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/s.1417rul.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/1417lesko0916.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.1417clark.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.1417clark2.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.1417clark3.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.1417kopec.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.1417kopec3.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.1417leach.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/h.1417energy environment and natural resources.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1417.swe.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1417.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1417.heenr.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1417.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1417.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1417.sfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback