AZ SB1412 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Surface water; adjudication sequence

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surface water; adjudication sequence

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateChapter 189
2017-04-24SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-20SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-20SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (21-9-0-0)
2017-04-20SenateSenate concurs
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-18SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-1-0)
2017-04-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-28HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-28HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-16HouseHouse LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2017-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-03-02HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2017-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-23HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0)
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-06SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0)
2017-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45182Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45254Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45257Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45258Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
45261Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69255
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1412p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1412s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1412h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0189.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1412griffin0922.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1412barton.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1412land agriculture and rural affairs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69255&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69255&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69255&billStatusActionId=175556&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69255&billStatusActionId=175420&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69255&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69255&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69255&billStatusActionId=176846&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69255&billStatusActionId=177028&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69255&billStatusActionId=177106&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69255&billStatusActionId=177109&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback