AZ SB1408 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agricultural best management; dust; districts
Title
Agricultural best management; dust; districts
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Rep. Stephen Pierce [R] |
Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-07 | House third reading , voting: (38-17-5-0) | |
2010-04-06 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-1-0-3-0) | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-23 | House ENV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-3-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to House ENV Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House read second time | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House ENV Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-08 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (19-9-2-0) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Consent Calendar March 01, 2010 @ 2:33 PM | |
2010-03-02 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |