AZ SB1393 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Chapter 128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dissolution; human embryos; disposition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dissolution; human embryos; disposition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenateChapter 128
2018-04-03SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-29SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-25-2-0)
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-07HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-22HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0)
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-07SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25318.03New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70559
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1393p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1393s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0128.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.13931044.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1393hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1393rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1393barto0902.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70559&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70559&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70559&billStatusActionId=181560&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70559&billStatusActionId=181613&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70559&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70559&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70559&billStatusActionId=182761&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70559&billStatusActionId=182765&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback