AZ SB1390 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2158
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-21)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-21)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
TPT; additional rate; education.
Title
TPT; additional rate; education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Chapter 74 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-6-1-0) |
2018-03-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate third reading None voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2158 (Replaces) 2018-03-22 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
Additional Rate
Distribution Of Monies
Education - Title 15
Education Funding
Rfe
Tax Credits
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Tpt
Transaction Privilege Tax
Use Tax
Distribution Of Monies
Education - Title 15
Education Funding
Rfe
Tax Credits
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Tpt
Transaction Privilege Tax
Use Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1472 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1648 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 2084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 2085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 241.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 977 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5010.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5029.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5029.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1072.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |