AZ HB2158 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Note: Legislation replaced by SB1390

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

TPT; additional rate; education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TPT; additional rate; education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-12HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-17HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-16HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-16HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-01-16HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1390 (Replaced by) 2018-03-26 - Chapter 74

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
151472Amended CodeSee Bill Text
151648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15241.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15971Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15977Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425010.01New CodeSee Bill Text
425029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425029.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425029.02New CodeSee Bill Text
425155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431072.02New CodeSee Bill Text
43222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43323Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69881
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2158p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2158h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2158boyer.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2158education.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69881&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69881&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69881&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69881&billStatusActionId=182629&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback