AZ SB1380 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Referred to House HHS Committee
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Referred to House HHS Committee
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Council on long-term care; reports
Title
Council on long-term care; reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2011-03-22 | House read second time | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-14 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-14 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-7-2-0) | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-3-1-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |