AZ SB1374 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Crisis standards of care; requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crisis standards of care; requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-15HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-11HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-03-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-09HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
2021-03-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2021-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-10SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2021-01-27SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36791New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75399
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1374p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1374s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.13741205.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1374hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1374floorbarto.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483562
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484186
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486823
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75399&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75399&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75399&billStatusActionId=201144&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75399&billStatusActionId=202901&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75399&billStatusActionId=202951&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback