AZ SB1372 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - Referred to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - Referred to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Water resources; salt cedar appropriation
Title
Water resources; salt cedar appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Pancrazi [D] | Rep. Charlene Fernandez [D] | Sen. Lisa Otondo [D] | Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] |
Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-17 | House | House AWL Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-2-0) |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to House AWL Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Assigned to House AWL Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate WE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate WE Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WE Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |