AZ SB1366 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
AHCCCS; naturopathic physicians; contractors
Title
AHCCCS; naturopathic physicians; contractors
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ahcccs (see Also: Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System)
Approved List
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs)
Conditional Enactment (h)
Contractors
Contracts
Drugs
Naturopathic Physicians
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Supplements
Therapies
Approved List
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs)
Conditional Enactment (h)
Contractors
Contracts
Drugs
Naturopathic Physicians
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Supplements
Therapies
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2904.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |