AZ SB1366 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - Referred to House HEALTH Committee
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - Referred to House HEALTH Committee
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Laboratories; pharmacogenetic testing
Title
Laboratories; pharmacogenetic testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |