AZ SB1350 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Government contract workers; strike prohibition
Title
Government contract workers; strike prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Murphy [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Chester Crandell [R] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] |
Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Rep. Adam Kwasman [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |