AZ SB1347 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - House AWL Committee action: Discussed and Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - House AWL Committee action: Discussed and Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
County dust control; residential property
Title
County dust control; residential property
Sponsors
Sen. David Farnsworth [R] | Sen. Susan Donahue [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Rep. John Allen [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | House AWL Committee action: Discussed and Held |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to House AWL Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned to House AWL Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate NR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate NR Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NR Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |