AZ SB1336 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Housing fund; seriously mentally ill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing fund; seriously mentally ill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-28HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-19HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-18HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-03-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-03-14HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-14SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0)
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
413955.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71962
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1336p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1336s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1336hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1336allen.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1336floorcarter1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1336barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1336health human services.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71962&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71962&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71962&billStatusActionId=188356&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71962&billStatusActionId=188367&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71962&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71962&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback