AZ SB1331 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Model city tax code; changes
Title
Model city tax code; changes
Sponsors
Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Chapter 121 | |
2014-04-22 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (25-4-1-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-15 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-19-0-0) |
2014-04-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-1-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate PS Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PS Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |