AZ SB1330 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
On-site ballot tabulation; containers
Title
On-site ballot tabulation; containers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Governor Vetoed | |
2024-04-10 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Containers (h)
Early Voting
Election Day
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Fund
On-site Ballot Tabulation
Procedure
Secretary Of State
Secured Containers
Transfer Of Monies
Early Voting
Election Day
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Fund
On-site Ballot Tabulation
Procedure
Secretary Of State
Secured Containers
Transfer Of Monies