AZ SB1326 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Disclosures; campaign finance; lobbying; enforcement
Title
Disclosures; campaign finance; lobbying; enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate ELEC Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |