AZ SB1325 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-27 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-27 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed firearms; schools; authorization requirements
Title
Concealed firearms; schools; authorization requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-5-0-0-0) |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2013-03-25 | House | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-03-25 | House | House ED Committee action: Withdrawn |
2013-03-20 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-25 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-1-0) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |