AZ SB1311 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2301
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
CTEDs; letter grades; exclusion.
Title
CTEDs; letter grades; exclusion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2301 (Replaced by) 2021-02-18 - Chapter 25
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 393.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |