AZ SB1311 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Material witnesses; contempt; detention; bond
Title
Material witnesses; contempt; detention; bond
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 144 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2019-04-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do pass on reconsideration, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 4073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4081 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4082 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4083 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4084 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4085 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |