AZ SB1310 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Earned release credits; drug offenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Earned release credits; drug offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07SenateChapter 310
2019-06-07SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-27SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2019-05-27SenateSenate concurs
2019-05-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-05-27SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-27HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-05-27HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-04-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-27HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-14SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2019-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31229.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411604.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71930
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1310p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1310s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1310h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0310.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.13100822.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1310jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1310engel.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71930&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71930&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71930&billStatusActionId=186775&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71930&billStatusActionId=187216&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71930&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71930&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71930&billStatusActionId=188911&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71930&billStatusActionId=189844&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71930&billStatusActionId=189857&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71930&billStatusActionId=189945&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71930&billStatusActionId=189956&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback