AZ SB1309 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Renewable energy; environmental impact; committee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable energy; environmental impact; committee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-23HouseHouse LARA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-21HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0)
2017-02-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-06SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2017-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2017-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69112
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1309p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1309s.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1309nrew.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.13090123.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1309farley0841.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1309barton se.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1309land agriculture and rural affairs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69112&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69112&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69112&billStatusActionId=175209&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69112&billStatusActionId=174898&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69112&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69112&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback