AZ SB1305 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2458
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Race; ethnicity; prohibited instruction.
Title
Race; ethnicity; prohibited instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-03-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2023-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2458 (Replaces) 2023-02-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Subjects
Abuse Prevention
Child Assault Awareness
Civil Penalty
Curriculum
Definitions
Disciplinary Action
Education - Title 15
Ethnicity
Instruction
Legal Action
Prohibited Instruction
Race
Repeal
Child Assault Awareness
Civil Penalty
Curriculum
Definitions
Disciplinary Action
Education - Title 15
Ethnicity
Instruction
Legal Action
Prohibited Instruction
Race
Repeal