AZ HB2458 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1305
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Race; ethnicity; prohibited instruction
Title
Race; ethnicity; prohibited instruction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-31 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1305 (Replaced by) 2023-03-09 - Governor Vetoed