AZ SB1298 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Government mask mandate; prohibition
Title
Government mask mandate; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Exception
Government Mask Mandate
Governmental Entities
Masks
Prohibition
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Public Health Control
Repeal
Government Mask Mandate
Governmental Entities
Masks
Prohibition
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Public Health Control
Repeal