AZ SB1298 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacists; drug therapy protocols
Title
Pharmacists; drug therapy protocols
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-06 | House third reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-28 | House Consent Calendar March 28, 2011 @ 3:07 PM | |
2011-03-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-09 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2011-03-07 | House read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-28 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-1-1-0) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-27 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |