AZ SB1294 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance and financial institutions; continuation
Title
Insurance and financial institutions; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 38 |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Continuation
Department Of Insurance
Financial Institutions
Insurance
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Department Of Insurance
Financial Institutions
Insurance
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3020.17 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3025.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |