AZ SB1291 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Residential contractor assessments; recovery fund
Title
Residential contractor assessments; recovery fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-9-5-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Contractors
Fees
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Recovery Fund
Residential Contractor Assessments
Fees
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Recovery Fund
Residential Contractor Assessments