AZ SB1289 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Storm water discharges; construction sites
Title
Storm water discharges; construction sites
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-10 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-10 | Senate final reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2012-04-10 | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-09 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-09 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-04 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-04-04 | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-17-5-0) | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-13 | House ENV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to House ENV Committee | |
2012-02-15 | House read second time | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to House ENV Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-09 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-09 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Consent Calendar February 06, 2012 @ 1:17 PM | |
2012-02-07 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-07 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-06 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate WLRD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |