AZ SB1282 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Racing omnibus
Title
Racing omnibus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 22 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 22 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Chapter 277 | |
2014-05-05 | Governor Line Item Veto - Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (23-3-4-0) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-17 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-9-3-0) |
2014-04-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-1-3-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate NRRA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate NRRA Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRRA Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |