AZ SB1268 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Adequate water supply requirements; municipalities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adequate water supply requirements; municipalities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Energy Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-09 Governor Vetoed
2016-05-04 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-04SenateSenate final reading , voting: (17-12-1-0)
2016-05-04SenateSenate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2016-04-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-31HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-03-31HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-25-2-0)
2016-03-16HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2016-03-15HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-15HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-14HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2016-02-23HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-10HouseHouse AWL Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-2-0)
2016-02-24HouseReferred to House AWL Committee
2016-02-24HouseHouse read second time
2016-02-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-02-23HouseAssigned to House AWL Committee
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-02-18SenateTransmit to House
2016-02-18SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (21-8-1-0)
2016-02-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-01-26SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-08SenateSenate WE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2016-01-27SenateReferred to Senate WE Committee
2016-01-27SenateSenate read second time
2016-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate WE Committee
2016-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=SB1268
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1268p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1268s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1268h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/s.1268gg.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/s.1268gg2.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/s.1268we.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1268.swe.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1268.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1268.hawl.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1268.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1268.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1268.sfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback