AZ SB1260 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax exemptions; statutory conformity
Title
Property tax exemptions; statutory conformity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-15-1-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-2-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Conditional Enactment
Definitions
Education - Title 15
Gdp Price Deflator
Property Tax Exemptions
Statutory Conformity
Taxation - Title 42
Veterans
Definitions
Education - Title 15
Gdp Price Deflator
Property Tax Exemptions
Statutory Conformity
Taxation - Title 42
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 11111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 11127 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 11152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 15053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |