AZ SB1259 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (15-11-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (15-11-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Recounts; requests; procedures; audits
Title
Recounts; requests; procedures; audits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (15-11-4-0) |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2022-06-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-06-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Attorney General
Audits
Conduct Of Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Exemptions
Legislative Council
Procedures
Recount (h)
Recounts
Requests
Secretary Of State
Audits
Conduct Of Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Exemptions
Legislative Council
Procedures
Recount (h)
Recounts
Requests
Secretary Of State
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 661.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 661.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |