AZ SB1251 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; family health pilot program.
Title
Appropriations; family health pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] | Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] |
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] | Sen. Wendy Rogers [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] | Sen. Michelle Ugenti-Rita [R] |
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |