AZ SB1247 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Residential care institutions; children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential care institutions; children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House - Representative Butler to include the Butler flr amendment (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateChapter 134
2019-04-24SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-18SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-04-15HouseHouse motion to amend
2019-04-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-04-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-21HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41619.57Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8804Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71850
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1247p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1247s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0134.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1247brophy mcgee.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1247hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1247floorbrophy mcgee.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1247butler.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71850&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71850&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71850&billStatusActionId=186800&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71850&billStatusActionId=187213&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71850&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71850&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71850&billStatusActionId=188950&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71850&billStatusActionId=188953&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71850&billStatusActionId=189012&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback