AZ SB1244 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Committee of reference; standing committee
Title
Committee of reference; standing committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-02 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 3101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 4402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2954 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |