AZ SB1227 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2545
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Chapter 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Chapter 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Colorado River drought contingency amendments
Title
Colorado River drought contingency amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Sine Kerr [R] | Sen. Lisa Otondo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Chapter 1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-01-31 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-0-1) |
2019-01-31 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2545 (Replaces) 2019-01-31 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Arizona System Conservation Fund
Colorado River Drought Contingency Amendments
Delayed Repeal
Emergency
Legislative Intent
Severability
Temporary Groundwater And Irrigation Efficiency Projects Fund
Water
Waters - Title 45
Arizona System Conservation Fund
Colorado River Drought Contingency Amendments
Delayed Repeal
Emergency
Legislative Intent
Severability
Temporary Groundwater And Irrigation Efficiency Projects Fund
Water
Waters - Title 45
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 118 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 2425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 615.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 802.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 851.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 852.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 853.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 855.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |