AZ SB1227 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2545

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Chapter 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Colorado River drought contingency amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado River drought contingency amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateChapter 1
2019-01-31SenateGovernor Signed
2019-01-31SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-01-31SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-01-31HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-0-1)
2019-01-31HouseTransmit to House
2019-01-31SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0)
2019-01-31SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-01-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-30SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-30SenateSenate WAG Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2019-01-29SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate WAG Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2545 (Replaces) 2019-01-31 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45118Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
452425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45514Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45615.01Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
45802.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45851.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45852.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45853.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45855.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71807
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1227p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1227s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0001.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1227kerr.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1227wag.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1227floorfann.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71807&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71807&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71807&billStatusActionId=185176&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71807&billStatusActionId=185178&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71807&billStatusActionId=185192&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback