AZ SB1225 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to House AWL Committee
Pending: House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to House AWL Committee
Pending: House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial hemp; study committee
Title
Industrial hemp; study committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House AWL Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House AWL Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate NR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate NR Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NR Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |