AZ SB1217 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Precinct officers; salaries
Title
Precinct officers; salaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Chapter 113 | |
2014-04-22 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-15 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-4-0-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-1-0) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |