AZ SB1193 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; Loop 101; screen wall
Title
Appropriation; Loop 101; screen wall
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. Shawnna Bolick [R] | Rep. Quang Nguyen [R] |
Rep. Judy Schwiebert [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-16 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adot (see Also: Department Of Transportation)
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Loop 101
Screen Wall
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Loop 101
Screen Wall