AZ SB1188 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hospital internships; residencies; clinical fellowships
Title
Hospital internships; residencies; clinical fellowships
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Linda Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Governor Signed | |
2012-03-27 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate final reading , voting: (21-6-3-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-22 | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-02 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2012-03-02 | House read second time | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-27 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-27 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Senate HMLR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-1-1-0) | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2012-01-23 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |