AZ SB1159 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile commitment; dependent; incorrigible children
Title
Juvenile commitment; dependent; incorrigible children
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-0-0-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |